EP1368782 - COORDINATE CALIBRATION FOR SCANNING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Precision, Inc. 1040 12th Avenue NW Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Applied Precision, LLC 1040 12th Avenue N. W. Issaquah, Washington 98027-8929 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Carl, S. 5029 37th Avenue N.E. Seattle, WA 98105 / US | 02 /
KRAFT, Raymond, H. 1040 12th Avenue N.W. Issaquah, WA 98027-8929 / US | 03 /
STROM, John, Timothy 1547 S.W. 12th Court North Bend, WA 98045 / US | 04 /
CAVELERO, Mark, D. 1040 12th Avenue N.W. Issawuah, WA 98027-8929 / US | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/50] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02713408.9 | 15.01.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002US01082 | Priority number, date | US20010262000P | 16.01.2001 Original published format: US 262000 P | US20020047458 | 14.01.2002 Original published format: US 47458 | [2008/49] |
Former [2003/50] | US20010262000P | 16.01.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02057999 | Date: | 25.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368782 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/32, G06T7/00 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G06T7/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/50] | G06K9/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOORDINATENKALIBRATION FÜR SCAN-SYSTEME | [2003/50] | English: | COORDINATE CALIBRATION FOR SCANNING SYSTEMS | [2003/50] | French: | CALIBRAGE COORDONNE POUR SYSTEMES DE BALAYAGE | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 05.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5038035 (NISHIMURA NOBUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 4-9 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 55 *; | [XY]US5581487 (KELLY ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-15 * column 5, line 17 - column 16, line 65 * [Y] 4-9; | [A]US5644512 (CHERNOFF DONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1008956 (SYNOPTICS LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 4-9 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] * | International search | [Y]US4518992 (KESSLER LAWRENCE W [US], et al); | [Y]US6026172 (LEWIS JR CLARENCE A [US], et al) |