EP1349744 - SPLIT LIFT GATE SWING SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intier Automotive Inc. 600 Wilshire Drive Troy, MI 48084 / US | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELCH, Christopher 117 Mohawk Pontiac, MI 48341 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Ben, S. 20953 Woodland 104 Northville, MI 48167 / US | 03 /
NEALE, Colin, G. 39473 Village Run Drive Northville, MI 48167 / US | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/47] | 01 /
WELCH, Christopher Apt. 201, 36934 Blanchard Boulevard Farmington Hills, MI 48167 / US | ||
02 /
CHANG, Ben, S. 20953 Woodland 104 Northville, MI 48167 / US | |||
03 /
NEALE, Colin, G. 39473 Village Run Drive Northville, MI 48167 / US | |||
Former [2003/41] | 01 /
WELCH, Christopher Apt. 201, 36934 Blanchard Boulevard Farmington Hills, MI 48167 / US | ||
02 /
CHANG, Ben, S. 42637 Northville Place 804 Northville, MI 48167 / US | |||
03 /
NEALE, Colin, G. 39473 Village Run Drive Northville, MI 48167 / US | Representative(s) | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02713409.7 | 14.01.2002 | [2003/41] | WO2002US01086 | Priority number, date | US20010261398P | 12.01.2001 Original published format: US 261398 P | US20010322128P | 13.09.2001 Original published format: US 322128 P | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055332 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349744 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349744 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/015, B60N2/30 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
B60J5/101 (EP,US);
B60N2/01508 (EP,US);
B60N2/30 (EP,US);
B60N2/3009 (EP,US);
B60N2/3015 (EP,US);
B60N2/3022 (EP,US);
B60N2/3031 (EP,US);
B60N2/3047 (EP,US);
B60N2/305 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAPPSITZ FÜR HECKTÜR | [2003/41] | English: | SPLIT LIFT GATE SWING SEAT | [2003/41] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE SIEGE ESCAMOTABLE POUR UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 07.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05016072.0 / EP1586481 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.01.2007 | FR | 31.01.2007 | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/51] | GB | 14.01.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3202453 (RICHARDS JESSE W) [A] 1-6,8,9 * column W *; | [A]DE4237258 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XA]DE4406651 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,11-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 55; figure 1; claims 1-4 * [A] 2; | [A]FR2725669 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-6,8,12-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO9929534 (MAGNA INTERIOR SYS INC [CA]) [A] 1-5,8-10,12,14,15 * abstract *; | [A]DE19943454 (KEIPER GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,8-10 * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 15; figures 1-4; claims 1-7 * |