EP1393063 - AUTOMATED FLOCCULATION TITRIMETER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING RESEARCH CORPORATION, doing business as, WESTERN RESEARCH INSTITUTE 365 North 9th Street Laramie, WY 82072-3380 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING RESEARCH CORPORATION, doing business as, WESTERN RESEARCH INSTITUTE 365 North 9th Street Laramie, WY 82072-3380 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULI, Adam, T. 4404 Thomson Road Cheyenne, WY 820009 / US | 02 /
BRANTHAVER, Jan, F. 1000 East Garfield Street, No 17 Laramie, WY 82070 / US | 03 /
SCHABRON, John, F. 1805 Arnold Street Laramie, WY 82070 / US | 04 /
ROBERTSON, Raymond E. 1719 W Hill Road Laramie, WY 82072 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02713567.2 | 05.02.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002US03983 | Priority number, date | US20010266555P | 05.02.2001 Original published format: US 266555 P | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02063292 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1393063 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/16, G01N27/49, B01F15/02, B32B11/06, C08L95/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G01N31/16 (EP,US);
G01N21/79 (EP,US);
G01N21/83 (EP,US);
G01N33/42 (EP,US);
G01N31/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES FLOCKUNGSTITRIMETER-SYSTEM | [2004/10] | English: | AUTOMATED FLOCCULATION TITRIMETER SYSTEM | [2004/10] | French: | SYSTEME AUTOMATISE DE TITRIMETRE DE FLOCULATION | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 31.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4950610 (TITTLE DOUGLAS L [US]); | [A]US5296193 (REGER HUBERT [DE], et al); | [A]US5924794 (O'DOUGHERTY KEVIN T [US], et al); | [A]US4999305 (WOLCOTT DUANE K [US], et al); | [A]US4283201 (DEFORD DONALD D, et al); | [A]US4095272 (JANZEN G JAY); | [A]US6048447 (HAYNER ROGER E [US], et al); | [AP]US6261356 (ISOBE KAZUO [JP], et al); | [A]US5990206 (TANAKA SHINGO [JP], et al); | [A]US5565239 (PIKE CLINTON W [US]) |