EP1387777 - METHOD FOR REGULATING THE SPEED OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/51] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLMANN, Manfred Pforzheimer Strasse 11 71706 Hardthof / DE | 02 /
LAUXMANN, Ralph Theodor-Storm-Strasse 25 70825 Korntal-Muenchingen / DE | 03 /
IRION, Albrecht Schaedleweg 2 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/07] | Application number, filing date | 02714028.4 | 16.02.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002DE00575 | Priority number, date | DE2001118708 | 12.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10118708 | [2004/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02083447 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387777 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387777 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/00, B60T7/22, B60T7/12, B60K31/10 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP,US);
B60K31/0008 (EP,US);
B60K31/04 (EP,US);
B60T7/22 (EP,US);
B60T2201/12 (EP,US);
B60W2720/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DER GESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2004/07] | English: | METHOD FOR REGULATING THE SPEED OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2004/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE LA VITESSE D'UN VEHICULE | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2642211 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * claims 7,8 *; | [DA]EP0166258 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1* page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph P; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0612641 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * claims 11,14 *; | [A]US5731977 (TANIGUCHI IKUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 5,10 *; | [X]DE19827445 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9920508 (RENAULT [FR], et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * claim 3 *; | [A]EP0965508 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0110]; figure 9 *; | [DY]US6149251 (WUERTH GEBHARD [DE], et al) [DY] 1,4,5 * claims 1,7-10 *; | [A]EP1075977 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,15 * | by applicant | DE3423063 | DE19615294 |