EP1368797 - TRACKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitaltrak Technology, Inc. 3701 Highland Avenue, Suite 300 Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OJA, Raymond, G. 2721 S. Walker Avenue San Pedro, CA 90731 / US | 02 /
HAMILTON, Milton, E. 700 N. Bubbling Wells Drive Glendora, CA 91741 / US | 03 /
MOORE, Roger, A. P.O. Box 2166 Running Springs, CA 92382 / US | 04 /
HREHA, Michael 5755 Spur Avenue Oceanside, CA 92057 / US | [2004/13] |
Former [2003/50] | 01 /
OJA, Raymond, G. 2721 S. Walker Avenue San Pedro, CA 90731 / US | ||
02 /
HAMILTON, Milton, E. 700 N. Bubbling Wells Drive Glendora, CA 91741 / US | |||
03 /
MOORE, Roger, E. 30930 Glen Oak Running Springs, CA 92382 / US | |||
04 /
HREHA, Michael 5755 Spur Avenue Oceanside, CA 92057 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02715102.6 | 13.03.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002US07512 | Priority number, date | US20010275519P | 14.03.2001 Original published format: US 275519 P | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02073559 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1368797 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/00 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
H04W52/0277 (EP,US);
G08B21/0222 (EP,US);
G08B21/0227 (EP,US);
G08B21/023 (EP,US);
G08B21/0247 (EP,US);
G08B21/0263 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | 07.10.2003 | LT | 07.10.2003 | LV | 07.10.2003 | MK | 07.10.2003 | RO | 07.10.2003 | SI | 07.10.2003 | Title | German: | NACHFÜHRVORRICHTUNG | [2003/50] | English: | TRACKING DEVICE | [2003/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REPERAGE | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 25.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/34] | 10.04.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.04.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5661460 (SALLEN ROY [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,11-14 * column 2, line 61 - line 64 * * column 3, line 56 - line 65 * * column 5, line 42 - line 57 * * column 6, line 26 - line 29 * * column 6, line 43 - line 49 * * column 7, line 7 - line 12 * * column 9, line 32 - line 42 * * column 11, line 15 - line 25 *; | [Y]US5722059 (CAMPANA JR THOMAS J [US]) [Y] 1-8,11-14 * column 6, line 1 - line 19 * * column 12, line 43 - line 57 * * column 26, line 40 - line 57 * * column 35, line 23 - line 28 * * column 51, line 26 - line 60 *; | [XY]EP0182762 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 9,10 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 10 * * page 3, line 3 - line 24 * [Y] 6-8; | [X]EP1039655 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0030] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5714932 (CASTELLON ROBERTO J [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 54 - line 60 * * column 3, line 64 - line 66 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 18 * |