EP1352200 - A COOLING SYSTEM, A COOLER AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL S.A. Avenida das Nações Unidas 12995 32 andar 04578-000 São Paulo SP / BR | [2006/49] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Empresa Brasileira de Compressores S.A. - Embraco Rua Rui Barbosa, 1020 89219-901 - Joinville, SC / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Marcos, Guilherme Rua General Osorio, 257 CEP-Joinville, SC / BR | 02 /
THIESSEN, Marcio, Roberto Rua Albatroz, 416 CEP-Joinville, SC / BR | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Bardo, Julian Eason, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Bardo, Julian Eason, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02715324.6 | 11.01.2002 | [2003/42] | WO2002BR00004 | Priority number, date | BR20010100052 | 11.01.2001 Original published format: BR 0100052 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055944 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352200 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352200 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02, G05D23/19 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0251 (EP,US);
F25B2700/151 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLSYSTEM, KÜHLER UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES KOMPRESSORS | [2003/42] | English: | A COOLING SYSTEM, A COOLER AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A COMPRESSOR | [2003/42] | French: | SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT, GLACIERE ET PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE COMPRESSEUR | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.07.2007 | CH | 18.07.2007 | CY | 18.07.2007 | DK | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | LI | 18.07.2007 | NL | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.10.2007 | PT | 18.12.2007 | IE | 11.01.2008 | LU | 11.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/33] | BE | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
IE | 11.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | BE | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
IE | 11.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | BE | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | BE | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CH | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 18.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3894282 (MACFARLAND JR RAYMOND W) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4653285 (POHL WALTER J [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4722019 (POHL WALTER J [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]GB2202966 (PRESTCOLD LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19804330 (K BUSCH GMBH DRUCK & VAKUUM DR [DE]) [A] * the whole document * | by applicant | US4850198 |