EP1468474 - SOCKET OUTLET COMPRISING A HINGED COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PC Electric Ges.m.b.H. Diesseits 145 4973 St. Martin / AT | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHRLICH, Robert Karl-Loy-Strasse 24 A-4600 Wels / AT | 02 /
IRSIGLER, Thomas Gregor Stangl Strasse 7c A-4780 Schärding / AT | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Kliment, Peter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Kliment, Peter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2004/43] | Kliment, Peter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8/3/8 1010 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 02715962.3 | 17.01.2002 | [2004/43] | WO2002AT00017 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03061077 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468474 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1468474 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
H01R13/5213 (EP);
H01R13/447 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, NL [2005/04] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKDOSE MIT EINEM KLAPPDECKELELEMENT | [2004/43] | English: | SOCKET OUTLET COMPRISING A HINGED COVER | [2004/43] | French: | PRISE FEMELLE POURVUE D'UN COUVERCLE RABATTABLE | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 16.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5571023 (ANTHONY JOHN C [US]) [Y] 1-6* column 4, line 49 - line 60; figures 9-15 *; | [Y]DE19903263 (KALKUS BERTHOLD [DE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * |