EP1354504 - PART FOR SUPPORTING AND FIXING AN ELECTRIC OR ELECTRONIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOFANOU S.A. Zone Industrielle 25340 Anteuil / FR | [2003/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECUPPE, Thomas 21 rue de la Sablonière F-25660 Montfaucon / FR | 02 /
BOURIOT, Béatrice 34 rue de la Tuilerie F-25250 Isle Sur Le Doubs / FR | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Gaglione, Renaud Cabinet Michel Moinas 13, chemin du Levant 01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Gaglione, Renaud Cabinet Michel Moinas, 13, chemin du Levant 01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | Application number, filing date | 02716208.0 | 22.01.2002 | [2003/43] | WO2002IB00179 | Priority number, date | FR20010000973 | 23.01.2001 Original published format: FR 0100973 | [2003/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02060230 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1354504 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/02, H05K7/00 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H05K7/005 (EP,US);
H05K7/02 (EP,US);
H01R4/2433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÜTZ-UND BEFESTIGUNGSTEIL FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES ODER ELEKTRONISCHES BAUTEILES | [2003/43] | English: | PART FOR SUPPORTING AND FIXING AN ELECTRIC OR ELECTRONIC COMPONENT | [2003/43] | French: | PIECE DE SUPPORT ET DE FIXATION D'UN COMPOSANT ELECTRIQUE OU ELECTRONIQUE | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 07.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2306597 (EMBASAYGUES MARC [FR]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 29 - line 38; figure 3 *; | [A]GB762640 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 35 - line 64; figure 1 * |