EP1281725 - POLYESTER RESIN, MOLDED ARTICLE THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYESTER RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIMORI, Yoshihiro, Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 02 /
FUJIOKA, Kiyotoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 03 /
NUKUI, Masahiro, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 04 /
YATSUGI, Yutaka, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 05 /
NAKAMICHI, Kazuya, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 06 /
SATOU, Noboru, Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 07 /
KAMBE, Toshio, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 08 /
NIWA, Hirotsugu Center Analyt. Chem. & Science, Inc., 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | ter Meer, Nicolaus, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr., et al TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02716389.8 | 25.01.2002 | [2003/06] | WO2002JP00562 | Priority number, date | JP20010016535 | 25.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001016535 | JP20010297454 | 27.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001297454 | [2003/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02059178 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1281725 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/86, B29C55/12, B65D1/00, C08J5/00, D01F6/62, C08G63/85, C08G63/82 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
C08G63/866 (EP,US);
C08G63/86 (KR);
C08G63/82 (EP,US);
C08G63/87 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/06] | C08G63/86, B29C55/12, B65D1/00, C08J5/00, D01F6/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYESTERHARZ, GEFORMTE ARTIKEL DARAUS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYESTERHARZ | [2003/06] | English: | POLYESTER RESIN, MOLDED ARTICLE THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYESTER RESIN | [2003/06] | French: | RESINE POLYESTER, ARTICLE MOULE A BASE DE CETTE RESINE POLYESTER ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE CETTE RESINE POLYESTER | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2002 | Translation filed | 24.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0061414 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-45,47,48 * claims 1-5 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 3 * * page 10, paragraphs 1,3 - page 11, paragraph 1 ** example 5; table III *; | [X]US5235027 (THIELE ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-44,47 * claims 1,3-6 * * column 1, line 50 - line 52 * * example 2 *; | [PX]WO0114452 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-47 * claims 1,28 * * page 1, line 21 - line 24 * * page 15, line 24 - line 27 * * examples 5,9,13,17,19 * | International search | [A]JP2000226500 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JP2000226444 (TOYO BOSEKI) |