EP1381895 - MACHINING AN INSULATED OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Emmerich Finkenweg 7 71134 Aidlingen / DE | 02 /
RUF, Tobias Gotenstrasse 10 71272 Renningen / DE | 03 /
THOMA, Peter Abliserstrasse 12 72108 Rottenburg / DE | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Barth, Daniel Mathias Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Hewlett-Packard-Strasse 8 76337 Waldbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Barth, Daniel Mathias Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Barth, Daniel c/o Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH, Patentabteilung, Herrenbergerstrasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02716782.4 | 15.02.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002EP01642 | Priority number, date | DE2001113740 | 21.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10113740 | [2004/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02077681 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1381895 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/245 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
G02B6/25 (EP,US);
G02B6/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Title | German: | BEARBEITEN EINER ISOLIERTEN OPTISCHEN FASER | [2004/04] | English: | MACHINING AN INSULATED OPTICAL FIBER | [2004/04] | French: | USINAGE D'UNE FIBRE OPTIQUE ISOLEE | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS62131209 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,12,13,16-22,24 * abstract ** page 50 *; | [X]JPS62223708 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [X] 1,12-16 * abstract *; | [Y]US5188268 (HAKOUN ROLAND [FR], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [XY]DE4227041 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-11,22,24,25 * column 2, line 45 - column 2, line 65; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 23 - line 27 * * column 4, line 50 - line 56 * [Y] 4-8; | [XY]US5469611 (SASAKI KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-11,24 * column 7, line 1 - line 36; figures 3,8,16,17,22 * * column 5, line 42 - line 62 * * column 8, line 28 - line 39 * [Y] 4-8; | [Y]EP0899594 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 5-8 * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 4; figures 1B,2A * * column 4, line 48 * |