EP1487847 - A SIMPLE PROCESS FOR OBTAINING BETA-AESCIN FROM INDIAN HORSE CHESTNUT (AESCULUS INDICA) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states COUNCIL OF SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | ||
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Bikram Inst. of Himalayan Bioresource Techn. Palampur 176 061 Himachal Pradesh / IN | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/52] | Appelt, Christian W. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02717016.6 | 25.03.2002 | [2004/52] | WO2002IB01208 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080636 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1487847 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1487847 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/256, C07H1/08 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
C07H1/08 (EP,US);
C07H15/24 (EP,US);
C07H15/256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN EINFACHES VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON BETA-AESCIN AUS DER INDISCHEN ROSSKASTANIE (AESCULUS INDICA) | [2004/52] | English: | A SIMPLE PROCESS FOR OBTAINING BETA-AESCIN FROM INDIAN HORSE CHESTNUT (AESCULUS INDICA) | [2004/52] | French: | PROCESSUS SIMPLE D'OBTENTION DE BETA-AESCINE A PARTIR DE MARRONNIER DE L'HIMALAYA (AESCULUS INDICA) | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2003 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 21.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2006 | CH | 16.08.2006 | CY | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | IT | 16.08.2006 | LI | 16.08.2006 | TR | 16.08.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | ES | 27.11.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | GB | 25.03.2007 | LU | 25.03.2007 | IE | 26.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
CY | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
GB | 25.03.2007 | ||
LU | 25.03.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
GB | 25.03.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3163636 (JOSEF WAGNER, et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE2530941 (MADAUS & CO DR) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1539127 (LEK TOVARNA FARMACEVTSKIH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0298148 (HERBE WIRKSTOFF GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3766166 (MENSSEN H, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA] - SRIJAYANTA, S. ET AL., "A COMPARATIVE STUDY OF THE CONSTITUENTS OF AESCULUS HIPPOCASTANUM AND AESCULUS INDICA", J. MED. FOOD, (1999), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 45 - 50, XP008007007 [DA] 1 * the whole document, in particular: page 49, conclusion * |