EP1415354 - CERIUM BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITI Scotland Limited Atrium Court 50 Waterloo Street Glasgow G2 6HQ / GB | [2011/11] |
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Plurion Limited 180 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Eda, Inc. 829 Heinz Street Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, Robert, EDA, Inc. 74 Muth Drive Orinda, CA 94563 / US | 02 /
DOUGHERTY, Brian, EDA, Inc. 1309 Mills Street, Apt. C Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
HARRISON, Stephen, EDA, Inc. 5352 Burrill Shawinigan, Québec G9B 1BS / CA | 04 /
MILLINGTON, J. Peter, EDA, Inc. 16 Valley Road, Weaverham Norwich, Cheshire CW8 3PP / GB | 05 /
MOHANTA, Samaresh, EDA, Inc. 704 Bodega Court Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02717450.7 | 12.02.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002US04749 | Priority number, date | WO2001US41678 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: PCT/US01/41678 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03017395 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415354 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415354 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/04 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
H01M6/04 (EP);
H01M10/05 (EP);
H01M10/0564 (EP);
H01M10/36 (EP);
H01M6/045 (EP);
H01M2300/0005 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | H01M2/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CERIUMBATTERIEN | [2004/19] | English: | CERIUM BATTERIES | [2004/19] | French: | BATTERIES AU CERIUM | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2009 | 28.02.2010 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE TR | Date: | 10.12.2008 | [2009/17] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2011 | BE | 19.01.2011 | CY | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | IT | 19.01.2011 | NL | 19.01.2011 | SE | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | IE | 12.02.2011 | LU | 12.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2011 | ||
LU | 12.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 19.01.2011 | |
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 19.01.2011 | |
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3360401 (ROBERT GRASSELLI, et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XY]US4382116 (GAHN RANDALL F, et al) [X] 1,2,11,18 * column 6, lines 13-20,28-44 * * claim 1 * [Y] 3-6,12-15; | [Y]US5679235 (HARRISON STEPHEN [CA]) [Y] 3-6,12-15 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, lines 35-50 * * column 6, lines 16-37 * * example 1 *; | [XY]WO9965100 (FARNOW TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,11,16 * page 3, lines 17-23 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, lines 1-9 * [Y] 17; | [Y]WO0057507 (UNISEARCH LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 17 * page 20, lines 32-39 * * claims 1,2,14,15 * | International search | [Y]US5672437 (YAJIMA TAMOTSU [JP]); | [Y]US6143443 (KAZACOS MARIA SKYLLAS [AU], et al) | by applicant | US4382116 |