|
13.02.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
02.01.2004 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.08.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
28 |