20.02.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.05.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.06.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
05.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
01.05.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
20.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.07.2006 |
First examination report |
|
26.07.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.07.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.05.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.09.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
23.09.2005 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
21.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
29.05.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
31.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
14.11.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
14.11.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
22.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|