Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004532559 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US83267001 | 11.04.2001 | US27946801 | 28.03.2001 | US0207506 | 14.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1374067 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2005 | A4 | EP1374067 | 02.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83267001 | 11.04.2001 | US27946801 | 28.03.2001 | US0207506 | 14.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02080004 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83267001 | 11.04.2001 | US27946801 | 28.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6957258 | 18.10.2005 | B2 | US2002143948 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83267001 | 11.04.2001 | US27946801 | 28.03.2001 |