EP1367938 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING BODY FLUID AND ELECTROLYTE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nellcor Puritan Bennett LLC 4280 Hacienda Drive Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | [2011/11] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Nellcor Puritan Bennett Incorporated 4280 Hacienda Drive Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITT, Joseph, M. 900G Brookside Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2010/14] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | Grubert, Andreas, et al King & Spalding 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Grubert, Andreas Baker Botts 41 Lothbury London EC2R 7HF / GB | ||
Former [2003/50] | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds, West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02717631.2 | 13.03.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002US07759 | Priority number, date | US20010810918 | 16.03.2001 Original published format: US 810918 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02074162 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1367938 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1367938 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/103 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
G01N21/359 (EP,US);
A61B5/0053 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/4878 (EP,US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEIT UND ELEKTROLYTSTÖRUNGEN | [2003/50] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING BODY FLUID AND ELECTROLYTE DISORDERS | [2003/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR CONTROLER DES TROUBLES DE LIQUIDES BIOLOGIQUES ET D'ELECTROLYTE | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5348003 (CARO RICHARD G [US]); | [Y]US6064898 (ALDRICH THOMAS K [US]); | [Y]WO0116577 (CME TELEMETRIX INC [CA], et al) |