EP1368170 - MOULDED WOOD COMPOSITES HAVING A NESTING PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Masonite International Corporation One South Wacker Drive Chicago, IL 60606 / US | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Darrell, M. RD 2 Box 181 Columbia Cross Roads, PA 16914 / US | 02 /
RINKER, William, E. RR 5 Box 5315-T724 Homan Hill Road Towanda, PA 18848 / US | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02717710.4 | 08.03.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002US08965 | Priority number, date | US20010803872 | 12.03.2001 Original published format: US 803872 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072326 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368170 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B27N5/00 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
B32B21/04 (EP,US);
B27N5/00 (EP,US);
B29K2311/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24091 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24603 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24628 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31989 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 11.09.2003 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFORMTE, STAPELBARE HOLZ-KOMPOSITE | [2003/50] | English: | MOULDED WOOD COMPOSITES HAVING A NESTING PROFILE | [2003/50] | French: | COMPOSITES EN BOIS MOULES PRESENTANT UN PROFIL D'EMBOITEMENT | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 08.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4830929 (IKEDA SADAO [JP], et al); | [DX]EP0688639 (MASONITE CORP [US]) [DX] 1-32 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, line 3 - line 32; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0747291 (MODEL BOX INC OF AMERICA [US]); | [PX]US6200687 (SMITH DARRELL M [US], et al) [PX] 1-32 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 8; figure -; claim - * |