|
19.01.2010 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2009 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.08.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2002 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
56 |