EP1391940 - SEMICONDUCTOR RADIATION DETECTING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acrorad Co., Ltd. 13-23, Aza-Suzaki Gushikawa-shi Okinawa 904-2234 / JP | [2007/45] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Acrorad Co., Ltd. 13-23, Aza-Suzaki Gushikawa-shi, Okinawa 904-2234 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIYAMA, Miki, Kyoto University Yoshida-honmachi, Sakyo-Ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 02 /
MURAKAMI, Masaki, Kyoto University Yoshida-honmachi, Sakyo-Ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 03 /
KYAN, Atsushi, ACRORAD CO., LTD. 13-23, Aza-Suzaki Gushikawa-Shi, Okinawa 904-2234 / JP | 04 /
OHNO, Ryoichi, ACRORAD CO., LTD. 13-23, Aza-Suzaki Gushikawa-Shi, Okinawa 904-2234 / JP | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02718533.9 | 11.04.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002JP03615 | Priority number, date | JP20010144313 | 15.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001144313 | [2004/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02093654 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391940 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391940 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/118, H01L31/032, H01L31/0224 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
H01L31/022408 (EP,US);
H01L31/0296 (EP,US);
H01L31/032 (EP,US);
H01L31/118 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/09] | H01L31/0296, G01T1/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Title | German: | HALBLEITER-STRAHLUNGSDETEKTIONSELEMENT | [2007/19] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR RADIATION DETECTING ELEMENT | [2004/09] | French: | ELEMENT DE DETECTION DE RADIATIONS A SEMICONDUCTEURS | [2004/09] |
Former [2004/09] | HALBLEITERSTRAHLUNGSDETEKTIONSELEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2003 | Translation filed | 06.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | IE | 11.04.2008 | LU | 11.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
LU | 11.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6011264 (LACHISH URI [IL], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 39 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - TAKAHASHI T ET AL, "High-resolution Schottky CdTe diode for hard X-ray and gamma-ray astronomy", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19991021), vol. 436, no. 1-2, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 111 - 119, XP004182082 [A] 1 * page 112 - page 113 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(99)00606-3 | International search | [A]JPS5630771 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]WO8600940 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]JPS62115391 (NIPPON MINING CO); | [A]JPH03248578 (NIPPON MINING CO); | [A]JPH07221340 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A] - MATSUMOTO ET AL., "Performance of a new Schottky CdTe detector for hard X-ray spectroscopy", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM, IEEE, (1997), vol. 1, pages 569 - 573, XP002951843 |