EP1360169 - SUCCINATE SALT OF O-DESMETHYL-VENLAFAXINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2015/04] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | ||
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940-0874 / US | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADFIELD, Anthony, Francis 85 North Middletown Road Apt. A8 Nanuet, NY 10954 / US | 02 /
SHAH, Syed, Muzafar 1 Ora Court East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | 03 /
WINKLEY, Michael, William 1 Arbor Road Campbell Hall, NY 10916 / US | 04 /
SUTHERLAND, Karen, Wiggins 4 Hallmark Drive New City, NY 10956 / US | 05 /
PROVOST, James, Andrew Farriers Cottage Sandy Lane Waltham Chase Southampton SO32 2LR / GB | 06 /
PARK, Aeri 1717 Southworth Branch Drive West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 07 /
SHIPPLETT, Rex, Alwyn 202 East Fox Street Wolcott, IN 47995 / US | 08 /
RUSSELL, Brenton, William 2018 Windflower Place West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 09 /
WEBER, Beat, Theodor Wiesenstrasse 4 CH-4800 Zofingen / CH | [2017/21] |
Former [2003/46] | 01 /
HADFIELD, Anthony, Francis 85 North Middletown Road Apt. A8 Nanuet, NY 10954 / US | ||
02 /
SHAH, Syed, Muzafar 1 Ora Court East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | |||
03 /
WINKLEY, Michael, William 1 Arbor Road Campbell Hall, NY 10916 / US | |||
04 /
SUTHERLAND, Karen, Wiggins 4 Hallmark Drive New City, NY 10956 / US | |||
05 /
PROVOST, James, Andrew Farriers Cottage Sandy Lane Waltham Chase Southampton SO32 2LR / GB | |||
06 /
PARK, Aeri 1717 Southworth Branch Drive West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | |||
07 /
SHIPPLETT, Rex, Alwyn 202 East Fox Street Wolcott, IN 47995 / US | |||
08 /
RUSSELL, Brenton, William 2018 Windflower Place West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | |||
09 /
WEBER, Beat, Theodor Wiesenstrasse 4 CH-4800 Zofingen / CH | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2017/21] |
Former [2010/38] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/46] | Wileman, David Francis Dr., et al Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02718949.7 | 11.02.2002 | [2003/46] | WO2002US04103 | Priority number, date | US20010268214P | 12.02.2001 Original published format: US 268214 P | US20010297963P | 13.06.2001 Original published format: US 297963 P | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02064543 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1360169 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1360169 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1360169 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/48, C07C55/10, A61K31/137, C07C215/64 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
C07C55/10 (EP,US);
C07C215/64 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,US);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/46] | C07C215/64, A61K31/137, A61P25/00, A61P13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | 30.07.2003 | LT | 30.07.2003 | LV | 30.07.2003 | MK | 30.07.2003 | RO | 30.07.2003 | SI | 30.07.2003 | Title | German: | O-DESMETHYL-VENLAFAXINE SUCCINAT SALZ | [2003/46] | English: | SUCCINATE SALT OF O-DESMETHYL-VENLAFAXINE | [2003/46] | French: | SEL DE SUCCINATE DE O-DESMETHYL-VENLAFAXINE | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07014868.9 / EP1864967 | EP10177304.2 / EP2319826 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2008
25.02.2009
WITHDRAWN EGIS Gyógyszergyár Nyrt 1106 Budapest Keresztúri út 30-38 / HU Opponent's representative Motsch, Andreas Patentanwälte Motsch & Seitz St.-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | 02
08.05.2008
19.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Roland, Dr. Hermanstr. 25d 86150 Augsburg / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | 03
08.05.2008
18.08.2010
WITHDRAWN SEPRACOR Inc 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 07152 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day, et al, et al Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2008
25.02.2009
WITHDRAWN EGIS Gyógyszergyár Nyrt 1106 Budapest Keresztúri út 30-38 / HU Opponent's representative Motsch, Andreas Patentanwälte Motsch & Seitz St.-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | ||
02
08.05.2008
19.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Roland, Dr. Hermanstr. 25d 86150 Augsburg / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | |||
03
08.05.2008
18.08.2010
WITHDRAWN SEPRACOR Inc 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 07152 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day, et al, et al Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2010/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2008
25.02.2009
WITHDRAWN EGIS Gyógyszergyár Nyrt 1106 Budapest Keresztúri út 30-38 / HU Opponent's representative Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Münchener Strasse 80a 85221 Dachau / DE | ||
02
08.05.2008
19.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Roland, Dr. Hermanstr. 25d 86150 Augsburg / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
03
08.05.2008
18.08.2010
WITHDRAWN SEPRACOR Inc 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 07152 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day, et al, et al Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2008
25.02.2009
WITHDRAWN EGIS Gyógyszergyár Nyrt 1106 Budapest Keresztúri út 30-38 / HU Opponent's representative Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Münchener Strasse 80a 85221 Dachau / DE | ||
02
08.05.2008
19.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Roland, Dr. Hermanstr. 25d 86150 Augsburg / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
03
08.05.2008
19.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE SEPRACOR Inc 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 07152 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day, et al, et al Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2008
13.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE EGIS Gyógyszergyár Nyrt 1106 Budapest Keresztúri út 30-38 / HU Opponent's representative Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Münchener Strasse 80a 85221 Dachau / DE | ||
02
08.05.2008
19.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Roland, Dr. Hermanstr. 25d 86150 Augsburg / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
03
08.05.2008
19.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE SEPRACOR Inc 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 07152 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day, et al, et al Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2008
13.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE EGIS Gyógyszergyár Nyrt 1106 Budapest Keresztúri út 30-38 / HU Opponent's representative Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Münchener Strasse 80a 85221 Dachau / DE | ||
02
08.05.2008
Lammert, Roland, Dr. Hermanstr. 25d 86150 Augsburg / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | |||
03
08.05.2008
WITHDRAWN SEPRACOR Inc 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 07152 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day, et al, et al Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | 22.07.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.02.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 06.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.08.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.04.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.01.2011 | Appeal received No. T0094/11 | 25.03.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.11.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 13.01.2011 | Appeal received No. T0094/11 | 24.03.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.11.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 27.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2007 | NL | 08.08.2007 | MC | 28.02.2008 | [2019/41] |
Former [2019/07] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2018/02] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | MC | 28.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0112669 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [DY] 1-64* the whole document and particularly example 26 *; | [DX]WO0032555 (SEPRACOR INC [US]) [DX] 1-64 * the whole document and particularly page 5, line 18: " succinic " *; | [X]WO0059851 (SEPRACOR INC [US]) [X] 1-64 * the whole document and particularly page 4, line 13: " succinic " *; | [Y]WO0076955 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [Y] 1-64 * the whole document * | Opposition | EP0639374 | EP0667150 | US5506270 | WO9744317 | WO9916417 | WO0072827 | - SALZMANN K., "Die Verbesserung der Eisenresorption durch Bernsteinsäure", MED. WELT, (197002), vol. 9, pages 358 - 359 | - TOUTAIN P.L. ET AL, "Prednisolone succinate and prednisolone acetate in cattle: Pharmacokinetics and action on the adrenal gland", AM. J. VET. RES., (198503), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 719 - 725 | - WOLFFRAM S. ET AL, "Carrier-mediated transport is involved in mucosal succinate uptake by rat large intestine", EXPERIMENTAL PHYSIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 79, pages 215 - 226 | - "Rote Liste" 2000, Präparat 71176 Tevilor, page 176, 179 | - MUTH E.A. ET AL, "Biochemical, neurophysiological, and behavioral effects of Wy-45,233 and other identified metabolites of the antidepressant venlafaxine", DRUG DEVELOPMENT RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1002/ddr.430230210, pages 191 - 199, XP000923124 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ddr.430230210 | - Druckexemplar of EP 04 010 248.5 (EP counterpart of WO 00/59851) | - BERGE S.M. ET AL, "The "Dumb Cops" image", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (197701), vol. 66, no. 1, pages 1 - 19 | - BYRN S. ET AL, "Pharmaceutical solids: A strategic approach to regulatory considerations", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 12, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1016241927429, pages 945 - 954, XP000996386 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1016241927429 | - MAJETICH G. ET AL, "Hydride-promoted demethylation of methyl phenyl ethers", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1994), vol. 35, no. 47, pages 8727 - 8730, XP002041135 | - LAROCK R.C., Comprehensive Organic Transformations, WILEY-VCH, (1999), vol. 2ND EDIT, pages 1013 - 1014 |