EP1434783 - LP MAMMALIAN PROTEINS; RELATED REAGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMEGADZIE, Bernard, Yaovi 6281 Welker Drive Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | 02 /
BASINSKI, Margret, Barbara 144 Buckingham Drive Indianapolis, IN 46208 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Dayue 10898 Pickens Court Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 04 /
HUANG, Chongxi 6756 Bluffridge Parkway Indianapolis, IN 46278 / US | 05 /
KELEHER, Gerald, Patrick 1680 Lodgetree Cove Indianapolis, IN 46280 / US | 06 /
PERKINS, Douglas, Raymond 6570 West Cross Trail New Palestine, IN 46163 / US | 07 /
ROSTECK, Paul, Robert, Junior 4247 Saffron Drive Indianapolis, IN 46237 / US | 08 /
ROWLINSON, Scott, William 7918 Cove Trace Court Indianpolis, IN 46256 / US | 09 /
SANKHAVARAM, Patanjali, Raghavacharya 11472 Regency Lane Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 10 /
SENO, Eugene, Thomas 5249 Carrollton Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | 11 /
SU, Eric, Wen 13447 Dunes Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 12 /
ZHI, Yu 712 Lockefield Court, Apartment 1 Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [2009/47] |
Former [2004/28] | Hiscock, Ian James European Patent Operations, Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Lilly Research Centre, Erl Wood Manor, Sunninghill Road Windlesham GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02719036.2 | 01.03.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002US05093 | Priority number, date | US20010276596P | 16.03.2001 Original published format: US 276596 P | US20010283654P | 13.04.2001 Original published format: US 283654 P | US20010285238P | 20.04.2001 Original published format: US 285238 P | US20010288548P | 03.05.2001 Original published format: US 288548 P | US20010290351P | 11.05.2001 Original published format: US 290351 P | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02074906 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1434783 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/28] | C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C07K14/00, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/28] | Title | German: | LP-SÄUGERPROTEINE; VERWANDTE REAGENZIEN | [2004/28] | English: | LP MAMMALIAN PROTEINS; RELATED REAGENTS | [2004/28] | French: | PROTEINES DE MAMMIFERES LP ET REACTIFS ASSOCIES | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 29.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/11] | 07.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9616075 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 8; claim 35 * * page 62 *; | [X]US5731149 (SELSTED MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * sequences 20, 67 *; | [X]US5750504 (BROEKAERT WILLEM FRANS [BE], et al) [X] 1-20 * sequence 11 *; | [X]WO9846743 (WELLCOME TRUST LIMITED AS TRUS [GB], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 18c *; | [X]WO9902714 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 113 - page 114 * * page 117 - page 118 *; | [X]WO0055629 (EOS BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 54 *; | [X]WO0058473 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * sequences 5867, 5868 *; | [X]WO0061754 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 3 *; | [X]WO0077255 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * sequence 157 *; | [X]EP1074617 (HELIX RES INST [JP]) [X] 1-20 * sequences 17027,17028 *; | [PX]WO0155314 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20* sequence 1647 *; | [PX]WO0162927 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * page 393 *; | [PX]WO0166689 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * sequences 147, 335 *; | [PX]WO0166690 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * page 97 - page 99 *; | [PX]WO0172961 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * sequence 14936 *; | [PX]WO0175067 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * sequence 36668 *; | [PX]WO0179294 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * sequences 15, 16 *; | [PX]WO0187917 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * page 129; sequence 710 *; | [PX]WO0200843 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * page 97 - page 98; claim 1; sequence 1 *; | [PX]WO0204600 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * page 114; claim 1; sequence 25 * * sequence 25 * * page 148 *; | [PX]WO0214368 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 * sequences 17, 18 *; | [E]WO0220754 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US]) [E] 1-20 * sequence 256 *; | [E]WO02063009 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * "LP283"; page 16 - page 17; claim 13; sequence 12 *; | [E]WO02064792 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC) [E] 1-20 * sequences 16, 42 *; | [E]WO02066643 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * sequences 23, 25, 28 * * page 72; claim 1 *; | [E]WO02068579 (PE CORP NY [US]) [E] 1-20 * sequences 5545, 11139 *; | [E]WO02068652 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-20; | [E]WO02068652 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * sequences 59, 60 *; | [E]WO02070669 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * page 152; claim 5; sequence 10 * * page 132 *; | [E]WO02072794 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * page 141 - page 142; claim 5 * * page 130 *; | [E]WO02079449 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * sequences 155,551 *; | [E]WO02101080 (PE CORP NY [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * sequence 2 *; | [E]WO03000863 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * page 305; claim 1; sequences 463, 464 *; | [E]WO03002765 (CANCER REC TECH LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-20 * figure 7 *; | [E]WO03002610 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC) [E] 1-20 * page 222 - page 223 * * page 186 - page 188 *; | [E]EP1308459 (HELIX RES INST [JP], et al) [E] 1-20 * sequences 864, 2834 *; | [E]WO03054152 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * sequence 918 *; | [E]WO03058201 (QUARK BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * sequence 50 *; | [E]WO03064616 (UNIV TEMPLE [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * page 78 - page 79 *; | [L] - "Protein of the invention SEQ ID NO:710.", Geneseq, (20040422), Database accession no. ADJ33733, URL: EBI, XP002305994 [L] 1-20 * abstract * | [L] - "Sequence 17027 from Patent EP1074617.", EMBL, (20031217), Database accession no. AX882122, URL: EBI, XP002305995 [L] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PX] - "Gene 30 human secreted protein homologous amino acid sequence #157.", Geneseq, (20010323), Database accession no. AAB64519, URL: EBI, XP002306004 [PX] 1-20 * abstract * | [X] - "human full-length cDNA 3-PRIME end of clone CS0DF038YL21 of FETAL BRAIN of Homo sapiens (human)", EMBL, (20010212), Database accession no. AL566375, URL: EBI, XP002305996 [X] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - MORIYAMA TATSUYA ET AL, "Purification and characterization of diacylglycerol lipase from human platelets", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY (TOKYO), (199906), vol. 125, no. 6, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 1077 - 1085, XP002305993 [A] * the whole document * | [PX] - "Homo sapiens DiGeorge syndrome-related protein FKSG3 mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20011002), Database accession no. AF305069, URL: EBI, XP002374306 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Homo sapiens unknown mRNA.", EMBL, (19980430), Database accession no. AF060862, URL: EBI, XP002374307 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Homo sapiens mRNA for MEGF7, partial cds.", EMBL, (19980824), Database accession no. AB011540, URL: EBI, XP002374308 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Rattus norvegicus mRNA for MEGF7, partial cds.", EMBL, (20000107), Database accession no. AB011533, URL: EBI, XP002374309 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [L] - "NOV25 protein sequence, SEQ ID 60.", Geneseq, (20040325), Database accession no. ADH48776, URL: EBI, XP002374310 | [L] - "NOV25 coding sequence, SEQ ID 59.", Geneseq, (20040325), Database accession no. ADH48775, URL: EBI, XP002374311 | [X] - "LDL receptor member LR3.", UniProt, (20000501), Database accession no. Q9UES7, URL: EBI, XP002374312 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - DONG Y ET AL, "MOLECULAR CLONING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF LR3, A NOVEL LDL RECEPTOR FAMILY PROTEIN WITH MITOGENIC ACTIVITY", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (19981029), vol. 251, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 784 - 790, XP001076809 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1998.9545 | [PX] - "Homo sapiens BAC clone RP11-561N12 from 7, complete sequence.", EMBL, (19991214), Database accession no. AC016769, URL: EBI, XP002374313 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Homo sapiens BAC clone RP11-561N12 from 7, complete sequence.", EMBL, (19991214), Database accession no. AC016769, URL: EBI, XP002374314 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Gallus gallus CEPU-Se alpha 2 isoform (CEPU-Se) mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20000824), Database accession no. AF292935, URL: EBI, XP002374315 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - SHARK K B ET AL, "Cloning, sequencing and localization to chromosome 11 of a cDNA encoding a human opioid-binding cell adhesion molecule (OBCAM)", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950403), vol. 155, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 213 - 217, XP004042416 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)00830-L | [X] - "human full-length cDNA 5-PRIME end of clone CS0DB003YO14 of NEUROBLASTOMA COT 10-NORMALIZED of Homo sapiens (human)", EMBL, (20010212), Database accession no. AL583491, URL: EBI, XP002374316 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Homo sapiens chromosome 15 clone RP11-300N24 map 15, LOW-PASS SEQUENCE SAMPLING.", EMBL, (20000120), Database accession no. AC021676, URL: EBI, XP002374317 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - SCHOFIELD P R ET AL, "MOLECULAR CHARACTERIZATION OF A NEW IMMUNOGLOBULIN SUPERFAMILY PROTEIN WITH POTENTIAL ROLES IN OPIOID BINDING AND CELL CONTACT", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19890201), vol. 8, no. 2, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 489 - 495, XP000602249 [X] 1-20 * figure 1 * | [X] - LIPPMAN D A ET AL, "OPIOID-BINDING CELL ADHESION MOLECULE (OBCAM)-RELATED CLONES FROM ARAT BRAIN CDNA LIBRARY", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1992), vol. 117, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 249 - 254, XP000602047 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(92)90734-7 | [X] - STRUYK A F ET AL, "CLONING OF NEUROTRIMIN DEFINES A NEW SUBFAMILY OF DIFFERENTIALLY EXPRESSED NEURAL CELL ADHESION MOLECULES", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199503), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 2141 - 2156, XP000953464 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "rx00304s Rat mixed-tissue library Rattus norvegicus cDNA clone rx00304 3', mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (19990429), Database accession no. AI639089, URL: EBI, XP002374318 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - HUTTNER K M ET AL, "STRUCTURE AND DIVERSITY OF THE MURINE CRYPTDIN GENE FAMILY", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (1994), vol. 19, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 448 - 453, XP002054342 [X] 1-20 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1994.1093 | [L] - "Mouse tumour suppressor mRNA SEQ ID NO:50.", Geneseq, (20040115), Database accession no. ADD29597, URL: EBI, XP002374319 | [X] - OUELLETTE A J ET AL, "A NOVEL MOUSE GENE FAMILY CODING FOR CATIONIC, CYSTEINE-RICH PEPTIDES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (19900615), vol. 265, no. 17, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 9831 - 9837,18702, XP000615234 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [L] - "Human dithp polynucleotide #256.", Geneseq, (20020730), Database accession no. ABK71790, URL: EBI, XP002374320 | [X] - MENDEZ E ET AL, "PRIMARY STRUCTURE OF OMEGA-HORDOTHIONIN, A MEMBER OF A NOVEL FAMILY OF THIONINS FROM BARLEY ENDOSPERM, AND ITS INHIBITION OF PROTEIN SYNTHESIS IN EUKARYOTIC AND PROLARYOTIC CELL-FREE SYSTEMS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BERLIN, DE, (1996), vol. 239, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 67 - 73, XP001182417 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1996.0067u.x | [X] - SOUZA CASTRO DE M ET AL, "COMPLETE AMINO ACID SEQUENCES OF TWO GAMMA-THIONINS FROM MAIZE (ZEAMAYS L.) SEEDS", PROTEIN AND PEPTIDE LETTERS, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, SCHIPHOL, NL, (19960801), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 0929-8665, pages 267 - 274, XP000623654 [X] 1-20 * figures 2,4 * | [X] - BLOCH C ET AL, "A NEW FAMILY OF SMALL (5 KDA) PROTEIN INHIBITORS OF INSECT ALPHA-AMYLASES FROM SEEDS OR SORGHUM (SORGHUM BICOLOR (L) MOENCH) HAVE SEQUENCE HOMOLOGIES WITH WHEAT GAMMA-PUROTHIONINS", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199102), vol. 279, no. 1, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 101 - 104, XP002041563 [X] 1-20 * figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(91)80261-Z | [X] - "Protease inhibitor.", UniProt, (19961101), Database accession no. Q39807, URL: EBI, XP002374321 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Mus musculus 13 days embryo cDNA, RIKEN full-length enriched library, clone:3930402I15, 5' end partial sequence.", EMBL, (20001129), Database accession no. BB569837, URL: EBI, XP002374322 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Human ORFX ORF2934 polypeptide sequence SEQ ID NO:5868.", Geneseq, (20010208), Database accession no. AAB43170, URL: EBI, XP002374323 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Human ORFX ORF2934 polynucleotide sequence SEQ ID NO:5867.", Geneseq, (20010208), Database accession no. AAC77379, URL: EBI, XP002374324 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "CEGP1 protein.", UniProt, (20001001), Database accession no. Q9NQ36, URL: EBI, XP002374325 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - GRIMMOND S ET AL, "Cloning, Mapping, and Expression Analysis of a Gene Encoding a Novel Mammalian EGF-Related Protein (SCUBE1)", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (20001115), vol. 70, no. 1, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 74 - 81, XP004437770 [X] 1-20 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.2000.6370 | [L] - "Novel protein (useful for identifying genetic disorders) #7.", Geneseq, (20040129), Database accession no. ADE07852, URL: EBI, XP002374326 | [PX] - "Cegp1 protein.", UniProt, (20001001), Database accession no. Q9JJS0, URL: EBI, XP002374327 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PX] - "Human diagnostic and therapeutic polynucleotide (DITHP) #202.", Geneseq, (20011204), Database accession no. AAS31187, URL: EBI, XP002374328 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PX] - "MEST347-G04.T3 ISUM5-RN Zea mays cDNA clone MEST347-G04 3', mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (20011116), Database accession no. BM074930, URL: EBI, XP002374329 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "687021A03.x1 687 - Early embryo from Delaware Zea mays cDNA, mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (19991118), Database accession no. AW181161, URL: EBI, XP002374330 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "HVSMEh0093P24f Hordeum vulgare 5-45 DAP spike EST library HVcDNA0009 (5 to 45 DAP) Hordeum vulgare cDNA clone HVSMEh0093P24f, mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (20000730), Database accession no. BE454491, URL: EBI, XP002374362 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PX] - "Human digestive system antigen SEQ ID NO: 1647.", Geneseq, (20011106), Database accession no. AAM92298, URL: EBI, XP002374363 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "human full-length cDNA 3-PRIME end of clone CS0DF038YL21 of FETAL BRAIN of Homo sapiens (human)", EMBL, (20010212), Database accession no. AL566375, URL: EBI, XP002374364 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PX] - "Homo sapiens yippee-like 3 (Drosophila), mRNA (cDNA clone MGC:10500 IMAGE:3639517), complete cds.", EMBL, (20010330), Database accession no. BC005009, URL: EBI, XP002374365 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [PX] - "Homo sapiens DiGeorge syndrome-related protein FKSG5 mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20011002), Database accession no. AF305622, URL: EBI, XP002374366 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "human full-length cDNA 5-PRIME end of clone CS0DK007YE05 of HELA CELLS COT 25-NORMALIZED of Homo sapiens (human)", EMBL, (20010211), Database accession no. AL555324, URL: EBI, XP002374367 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Neural secreted glycoprotein (CEPU-Se alpha 2 isoform).", UniProt, (19980601), Database accession no. O57596, URL: EBI, XP002374368 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [DA] - KRIEGER M ET AL, "STRUCTURES AND FUNCTIONS OF MULTILIGAND LIPOPROTEIN RECEPTORS: MACROPHAGE SCAVENGER RECEPTORS AND LDL RECEPTOR-RELATED PROTEIN (LRP)", ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOCHEMISTRY, PALTO ALTO, CA, US, (1994), vol. 63, ISSN 0066-4154, pages 601 - 637, XP002937333 [DA] * the whole document * | [A] - NEELS J G ET AL, "Interaction Between Factor VIII and LDL Receptor-related Protein. MODULATION OF COAGULATION?", TRENDS IN CARDIOVASCULAR MEDICINE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (2000), vol. 10, no. 1, ISSN 1050-1738, pages 8 - 14, XP002264412 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1050-1738(00)00036-0 | [A] - LODGE A P ET AL, "Co-localisation, heterophilic interactions and regulated expression of IgLON family proteins in the chick nervous system", MOLECULAR BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2000), vol. 82, ISSN 0169-328X, pages 84 - 94, XP002977169 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-328X(00)00184-4 | [A] - J. I. KOURIE AND A. A. SHORTHOUSE, "Properties of cytotoxic peptide-formed ion channels", AM J PHYSIOL CELL PHYSIOL, (2000), vol. 278, pages C1063 - C1087, XP002374273 [A] * the whole document * | International search | [XP]WO0175067 ; | [X] - HU G. ET AL., "Human unknown cDNA, complete cds", GENBANK, (19980430), Database accession no. (AF060862), XP002968940 | [X] - SMITH T.P.L., GENBANK, (20010312), Database accession no. (BG384148), XP002968938 | [XP] - SORES M.B., GENBANK, (20020228), Database accession no. (BM709084), XP002968939 | [A] - BONALDO ET AL., "Normalization and substraction: two approaches to facilitate gene discovery", GENOME RESEARCH, (199609), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 791 - 806, XP002918419 |