EP1370634 - RINSE-ADDED FABRIC CONDITIONING COMPOSITION FOR USE WHERE RESIDUAL DETERGENT IS PRESENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMEYERE, Hugo, Jean, Marie Linthoustraat 59 B-1785 Merchtem / BE | 02 /
DECLERCQ, Marc, Johan Ringlaan 77 B-1653 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 03 /
CAUWBERGHS, Serge, Gabriel, Pierre Sander Vijnantslaan 9 B-9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | 04 /
TURNER, John, Christopher Losweg 18 B-3090 Overijse / BE | 05 /
CUMMING, David, Xavante The Stables, Angerton Hall Hartburn, Northumberland NE61 4ES / GB | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 02719131.1 | 05.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002US06740 | Priority number, date | US20010273929P | 07.03.2001 Original published format: US 273929 P | US20010293446P | 24.05.2001 Original published format: US 293446 P | US20010294178P | 29.05.2001 Original published format: US 294178 P | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072745 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1370634 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370634 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/645 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
C11D1/835 (EP,US);
C11D1/645 (EP,US);
C11D3/001 (EP,US);
C11D3/0026 (EP,US);
C11D1/528 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHSPÜLMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE ANWENDUNG IN ANWESENHEIT VON WASCHMITTELRÜCKSTÄNDEN | [2003/51] | English: | RINSE-ADDED FABRIC CONDITIONING COMPOSITION FOR USE WHERE RESIDUAL DETERGENT IS PRESENT | [2003/51] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CONDITIONNEMENT POUR TISSUS A AJOUTER AU RIN AGE EN CAS DE DETERGENT RESIDUEL | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 18.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.2006
24.04.2007
WITHDRAWN Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB Opponent's representative Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.2006
24.04.2007
WITHDRAWN Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB Opponent's representative Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.2006
23.03.2006
WITHDRAWN Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB Opponent's representative Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | ||
Former [2006/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.2006
23.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB Opponent's representative Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | 20.04.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.10.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.04.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.06.2007 | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 21.05.2007 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/40] | 19.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2005 | BE | 08.06.2005 | CH | 08.06.2005 | CY | 08.06.2005 | FI | 08.06.2005 | FR | 08.06.2005 | IT | 08.06.2005 | LI | 08.06.2005 | TR | 08.06.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | PT | 14.11.2005 | IE | 06.03.2006 | ES | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/29] |
Former [2009/02] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
CY | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
FR | 08.06.2005 | ||
IT | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
FR | 08.06.2005 | ||
IT | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IT | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
FR | 04.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IT | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
FR | 04.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
FR | 04.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
FR | 04.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1576326 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-9,18,24-29 * example 5 * * page 2, line 2 - line 7 * * page 4, line 50 - line 64 *; | [XA]EP0018039 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10,13-19,22-30 * claims 1-3,7-9 * * examples II,V-IX,XV-XVIII,XXII * * page 16, line 29 - page 17, line 17 * [A] 17; | [X]US4360437 (WOLFES WILHELM H O) [X] 1-9,16-18,22-30 * examples F,G * * column 3, line 31 - line 55 ** column 6, line 38 - line 48 *; | [XA]US4855072 (TRINH TOAN [US], et al) [X] 1-10,15,18,19,22-33 * claims 1-3 * * column 3, line 21 - line 29 * * column 7, line 13 - line 44 * * column 10, line 40 - line 49 * * column 12, line 12 - line 20 * * examples VIII,XI,XII * * abstract * [A] 11,12,20,21; | [X]EP0369500 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10,13,15,18,19,22-33 * claim 20 * * example - * * page 10, line 50 - line 55 * * page 11, line 57 - page 12, line 3 * * abstract *; | [X]EP0669391 (WITCO SURFACTANTS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12,15,18-30 * examples 2-9 * * claim 1 * |