EP1384098 - METHOD OF OPERATING A NOISE-COMPENSATING GAIN CONTROLLER FOR AN OPTICAL AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avanex Corporation 40919 Encyclopedia Circle Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2004/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JU, Ray L 9 Timber Lane Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 02 /
LELIC, Muhidin 2 Barrington Road Horseheads, NY 14845 / US | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | McGowan, Cathrine D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | McGowan, Cathrine D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02719436.4 | 03.04.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US10634 | Priority number, date | US20010845402 | 30.04.2001 Original published format: US 845402 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02088779 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1384098 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/067, H01S3/102, H04B10/17 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
H04B10/2931 (EP,US);
H01S3/06754 (EP,US);
H01S3/13013 (EP,US);
H04B10/0731 (EP,US);
H04B10/2912 (EP,US);
H04B10/50 (EP,US);
H01S2301/02 (EP,US);
H01S2301/04 (EP,US);
H01S3/094011 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/18] | H01S3/00 | ||
Former IPC [2004/05] | G02B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES RAUSCHKOMPENSATIONSVERSTÄRKUNGSREGLERS FÜR EINEN OPTISCHEN VESTÄRKER | [2004/05] | English: | METHOD OF OPERATING A NOISE-COMPENSATING GAIN CONTROLLER FOR AN OPTICAL AMPLIFIER | [2004/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CONTROLEUR DE GAIN A COMPENSATION DE BRUIT POUR UN AMPLIFICATEUR OPTIQUE | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 06.12.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11112434 ; | [X]US6008935 (FUJITA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 39; figures 2,3 * * column 6, lines 7-54 * * column 7, lines 3-35 * * column 9, lines 9-34 *; | [A]US6198571 (YANG DAN D [CA]) [A] 1-6,11-18 * column 5, line 35 - column 7, line 65; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6215584 (YANG DAN DAN [CA], et al) [X] 1,11 * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 65; figure 2 *; | [PX]WO0221203 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1,11* for an english translation see US-A-2002/0041431: figures 1,2,9; paragraphs [0040]-[0043],[0051]-[0053] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11112434 A 19990423 (NIPPON TELEGR &TELEPH CORP | International search | [A]US5822112 (ITOU HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [AP]US6246514 (BONNEDAL DAG [SE], et al) |