EP1386021 - PICKLE LIQUOR ACID ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AK Steel Properties, Inc. 705 Curtis Street Middletown OH 45043 / US | [2005/50] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states AK Properties, Inc. 705 Curtis Street Middletown, OH 45043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODABAUGH, Ronald, D. 6340 Hathaway Road Lebanon, OH 45036 / US | 02 /
PRICE, David, M. 7634 Brookstone West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 03 /
BRYANT, Gregory, A. 8894 Hialeah Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Turi, Michael, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02719473.7 | 09.04.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002US11141 | Priority number, date | US20010282566P | 09.04.2001 Original published format: US 282566 P | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02081778 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1386021 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C23G1/08 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
C23G1/086 (EP,US);
G01N33/02 (KR);
C23G1/081 (EP,US);
G01N31/00 (EP,US);
G01N1/14 (EP,US);
Y10T436/15 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SÄURE-ANALYSATOR FÜR BEIZLÖSUNGEN | [2004/06] | English: | PICKLE LIQUOR ACID ANALYZER | [2004/06] | French: | ANALYSEUR D'ACIDE DE LIQUEUR DE DECAPAGE | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 09.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2005 | 09.12.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.12.2005 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5175502 (RODABAUGH RONALD D [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * column 2, lines 34-47 * * column 3, line 33 - line 66 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO0033061 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-24 * page 9, line 5 - page 15, line 14 * * page 4, line 12 - line 23 *; | [X]EP1067381 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 1-24 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * figure 1 *; | [X] - TAKAHARI TOMOO ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF THE AUTOMATED ANALYZER FOR NITRIC ACID, HYDROFLUORIC ACID AND FERRIC ION IN THE PICKLING SOLUTION OF STAINLESS STEEL", PREPR FOR ISIJ MEET, 104TH;HOKKAIDO, JPN SEP 27-29 1982, Trans Iron Steel Inst Jpn Feb 1982, (198202), vol. 23, no. 2, pages b - 55, XP008007157 [X] 1-24 * the whole document * |