EP1374220 - WALLS OR PARTITIONS HAVING ADJUSTABLE ACOUSTIC ABSORPTION AND/OR INSULATION PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCELOR France 1 à 5, rue Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint Denis / FR | [2006/34] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states USINOR S.A. Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13, cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states RECHERCHE ET DEVELOPPEMENT DU GROUPE COCKERILL SAMBRE Bld. de Colonster B57 4000 Liège / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOFFAUX, Cécile Rue de l'Abbaye 23 B-5336 Courrière / BE | 02 /
KERGEN, Richard Rue de la Gare 10/1 B-4347 Fexhe-le-Haut Clocher / BE | 03 /
MAGAIN, Pascal Rue d'Eppe 21a B-6470 Montbliart / BE | 04 /
MASERI, Fabrizio Rue Joseph Bouché 51 B-5310 Bolinne / BE | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Office Van Malderen Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | pronovem Office Van Malderen Bld. de la Sauveniére 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Van Malderen, Joelle Office Van Malderen, Boulevard de la Sauvenière, 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 02719573.4 | 25.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002BE00044 | Priority number, date | EP20010870065 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01870065 | [2004/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02077968 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374220 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/175, G10K11/16 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G10K11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÜLLE ODER WÄNDE MIT VERÄNDERBAREN SCHALLDÄMMUNGS- UND/ODER SCHALLABSORPTIONSEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2004/01] | English: | WALLS OR PARTITIONS HAVING ADJUSTABLE ACOUSTIC ABSORPTION AND/OR INSULATION PROPERTIES | [2004/01] | French: | ENVELOPPES OU PAROIS PRESENTANT DES PROPRIETES AJUSTABLES D'ISOLEMENT ET/OU D'ABSORPTION ACOUSTIQUE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH03114099 ; | [A]FR2312831 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3825626 (KRUPP STAHL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3707650 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910815), vol. 015, no. 320, Database accession no. (P - 1238), & JP03114099 A 19910515 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-6,14,17,18,20 * abstract * | by applicant | WO8903472 | JPH0869286 | SU1629576 | US4887692 | JPH1193670 | JPS62277044 | JPH04173420 | JPH04173426 | JPH02267433 | EP0375549 | JPH03114099 |