|
19.05.2005 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
05.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.02.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.01.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.01.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
25.01.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.01.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
23.02.2002 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |