Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] |
28.05.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
28.05.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
04.05.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
04.05.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
09.04.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
09.04.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
12.02.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.02.2004 | Change - inventor | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
20.01.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
17.10.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] |
17.10.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] |
04.09.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.07.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.11.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.09.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.09.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.06.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication |