EP1370895 - DEVICE FOR FIXING AND ADJUSTING AN ELEMENT TO BE SUPPORTED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem Défense Sécurité Le Ponant de Paris 27 Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/05] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states SAGEM SA 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLET, Jacques 45, allée des Chrysolites F-77176 Nandy / FR | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Geismar, Thierry NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [2009/37] |
Former [2003/51] | Geismar, Thierry Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02720064.1 | 13.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002FR00895 | Priority number, date | FR20010003842 | 21.03.2001 Original published format: FR 0103842 | [2003/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02075365 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1370895 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370895 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/182 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
G02B7/005 (EP,US);
G02B7/1827 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HALTERUNG UND JUSTIERUNG EINES BAUTEILS | [2003/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXING AND ADJUSTING AN ELEMENT TO BE SUPPORTED | [2003/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION ET DE REGLAGE D'UN ORGANE A SUPPORTER | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 16.12.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | GB | 02.08.2006 | IE | 02.08.2006 | IT | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | ES | 13.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | LU | 13.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | CH | 31.03.2007 | LI | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CY | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
LU | 13.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4988244 (SHELDON PAUL C [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * figure - *; | [A]DE29607680U (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,16 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5726815 (GUNTER JOHN B [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * figure 4 *; | [A]FR2761486 (CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]FR2773890 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1-6,10-12,16,17 * the whole document * |