EP1385844 - OXAZOLIDINONES CONTAINING A SULFONIMID GROUP AS ANTIBIOTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB Sodertalje 151 85 / SE | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Astrazeneca AB Sodertalje 151 85 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTS, Michael, John Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
SWAIN, Michael, Lingard Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 03 /
HALES, Neil, James 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 04 /
HUYNH, Hoan, Khai 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Phillips, Neil Godfrey Alasdair AstraZeneca AB Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Sodertalje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Phillips, Neil AstraZeneca AB, Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Sodertalje / SE | Application number, filing date | 02720195.3 | 03.04.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002GB01644 | Priority number, date | GB20010008765 | 07.04.2001 Original published format: GB 0108765 | US20010330588P | 25.10.2001 Original published format: US 330588 P | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02081470 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1385844 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1385844 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/14, A61K31/422, A61P31/04, C07D417/14 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D417/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | 07.11.2003 | LT | 07.11.2003 | LV | 07.11.2003 | MK | 07.11.2003 | RO | 07.11.2003 | SI | 07.11.2003 | Title | German: | EINE SULFONIMID-GRUPPE ENTHALTENDE OXAZOLIDINONE ALS ANTIBIOTIKA | [2004/06] | English: | OXAZOLIDINONES CONTAINING A SULFONIMID GROUP AS ANTIBIOTICS | [2004/06] | French: | OXAZOLIDINONES CONTENANT UN GROUPE SULFONIMIDE EN TANT QU'ANTIBIOTIQUE | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 27.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2006 | BE | 05.07.2006 | CY | 05.07.2006 | FI | 05.07.2006 | NL | 05.07.2006 | TR | 05.07.2006 | DK | 05.10.2006 | GR | 06.10.2006 | PT | 05.12.2006 | IE | 03.04.2007 | LU | 03.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CY | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
IE | 03.04.2007 | ||
LU | 03.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
IE | 03.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 05.07.2006 | |
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 05.07.2006 | |
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 05.07.2006 | |
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 05.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9507271 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [YD] 1-18 * figure 2; example 6; claim 1 *; | [AD]WO9615130 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * claim 1 *; | [AD]WO9709328 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-18* claim 1 *; | [AD]WO9737980 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE19707628 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * claim 1 *; | [AD]WO9854161 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * claim 1 *; | [YD] - GREGORY W A ET AL, "ANTIBACTERIALS. SYNTHESIS AND STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY STUDIES OF 3-ARYL-2-OXOOXAZOLIDINES. I THE B GROUP", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19890801), vol. 32, no. 8, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1673 - 1681, XP000573960 [YD] 1-18 * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00128a003 |