EP1382153 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTHENTICATING A USER ON A REMOTE SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2004/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEIMER, Wolfgang Am Hohwege 10 44879 Bochum / DE | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02720338.9 | 04.04.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002IB01085 | Priority number, date | EP20010110347 | 26.04.2001 Original published format: EP 01110347 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02089400 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382153 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382153 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F21/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM AUTHENTIFIZIEREN EINES BENUTZERS AUF EINEM FERNSERVER | [2004/04] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTHENTICATING A USER ON A REMOTE SERVER | [2004/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'AUTHENTIFIER UN UTILISATEUR SUR UN SERVEUR DISTANT | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 09.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.06.2009 | BE | 03.06.2009 | CY | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | FI | 03.06.2009 | IT | 03.06.2009 | NL | 03.06.2009 | TR | 03.06.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | ES | 14.09.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9956520 (HOUSE OF ADDED VALUE AB [SE], et al); | [A]US6112078 (SORMUNEN TONI [FI], et al); | [A]US6182229 (NIELSEN JAKOB [US]) | Examination | WO9944114 |