Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004026821 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010063558 | 16.10.2001 | KR0200721 | 19.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3718210B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2005 | B2 | JP2004521792 | 22.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010063558 | 16.10.2001 | KR0200721 | 19.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1436139 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2005 | A4 | EP1436139 | 14.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010063558 | 16.10.2001 | KR0200721 | 19.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03033245 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010063558 | 16.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100431662B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2004 | B1 | KR20030032145 | 26.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010063558 | 16.10.2001 |