EP1466420 - IMPROVED TIME TRACKING LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2004/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLESSENT, Luca 8308 Regents Road 3F San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02720819.8 | 18.01.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002US01554 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03063377 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466420 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466420 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
H04B1/7075 (EP);
H04B1/7085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ZEITNACHFÜHRSCHLEIFE | [2004/42] | English: | IMPROVED TIME TRACKING LOOP | [2004/42] | French: | BOUCLE DE POURSUITE DE SYNCHRONISATION AMELIOREE | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 18.08.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | IT | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | IE | 18.01.2011 | LU | 18.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | ES | 12.03.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.01.2011 | ||
LU | 18.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6141372 (CHALMERS HARVEY [US]) [A] 1-29* column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 30; figure 12 * |