EP1359891 - PRIMARY INTERMEDIATES FOR OXIDATIVE COLORATION OF HAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P&G-Clairol, Inc. One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Mu-III 5922 Taylor Drive West Chester Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
PAN, Yuh-Guo 119 Woodridge Drive Stamford, CT 06905 / US | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/46] | 01 /
LIM, Mu-III 31 Mayflower Drive Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | ||
02 /
PAN, Yuh-Guo 119 Woodridge Drive Stamford, CT 06905 / US | Representative(s) | Kohol, Sonia, et al Technical Centres Limited Procter & Gamble Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Kohol, Sonia, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2003/46] | Kohol, Sonia (GB), et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd., Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02720822.2 | 18.01.2002 | [2003/46] | WO2002US01581 | Priority number, date | US20010263583P | 23.01.2001 Original published format: US 263583 P | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02062308 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1359891 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359891 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/41, A61K8/49, A61Q5/10, C07C215/14, C07C215/76, C07C217/58, C07C217/84, C07D295/12 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
C07D295/135 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61K8/415 (EP,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,US);
A61K8/4953 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
C07C215/14 (EP,US);
C07C215/76 (EP,US);
C07C217/58 (EP,US);
C07C217/84 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/46] | A61K7/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRIMÄRE ZWISCHENPRODUKTE FÜR DIE OXIDATIVE HAARFÄRBUNG | [2003/46] | English: | PRIMARY INTERMEDIATES FOR OXIDATIVE COLORATION OF HAIR | [2003/46] | French: | COMPOSANTS INTERMEDIAIRES PRIMAIRES POUR COLORATION OXYDANTE DES CHEVEUX | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 19.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2006 | BE | 15.03.2006 | CH | 15.03.2006 | CY | 15.03.2006 | FI | 15.03.2006 | FR | 15.03.2006 | IT | 15.03.2006 | LI | 15.03.2006 | NL | 15.03.2006 | TR | 15.03.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | SE | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | ES | 26.06.2006 | PT | 16.08.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
CY | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
FR | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
FR | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]EP1116711 (WELLA AG [DE]) [PA] 1-24* abstract * | International search | US5183941 [ ] (PAN YUH-GUO [US], et al); | [YL]US5704948 (TERRANOVA ERIC [FR], et al) |