EP1379914 - MATRIX ADDRESSABLE ELECTROCHROMIC DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aveso, Inc. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2005/45] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Commotion Inc. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINCENT, John, B. 5005 Foxcroft Midland, MI 48642 / US | 02 /
FLICK, Derrick, W. 2637 N. Waskevich Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02721499.8 | 19.03.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002US08594 | Priority number, date | US20010277030P | 19.03.2001 Original published format: US 277030 P | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02075442 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1379914 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/155, G02F1/15, G02F1/17 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
C09K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1503 (KR,US);
G02F1/15 (EP);
G02F1/155 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/176 (EP,KR,US);
G02F2001/164 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATRIX-ADRESSIERBARE ELEKTROCHROME ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2004/03] | English: | MATRIX ADDRESSABLE ELECTROCHROMIC DISPLAY DEVICE | [2004/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ELECTROCHROMIQUE A ADRESSAGE MATRICIEL | [2004/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 26.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH06175165 ; | [X]US4146876 (ARELLANO ANGEL G, et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - line 50 * * column 3, line 46 - line 49 * * column 5, line 19 - line 21 * * column 5, line 26 - line 34 * * claims 8,10 *; | [X]US4175836 (REDMAN MICHAEL J [GB], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 30 - line 35 * * column 5, line 24 - line 29 * * column 5, line 40 - line 43 * * column 6, line 12; figure 3 *; | [XY]US4297005 (JOHNSON JR DAVID W, et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * column 6, line 35 - line 40 *[Y] 18; | [XA]EP0301513 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 6, line 30 * * page 6, line 52 * * page 4, line 18 - line 29 * [A] 9,17 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940926), vol. 018, no. 510, Database accession no. (P - 1804), & JP06175165 A 19940624 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1,8-11,13,17 * abstract * * idem * [Y] 18 |