Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100779471B | Global Dossier | 26.11.2007 | B1 | KR20040011492 | 05.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0209232 | 26.03.2002 | US82368001 | 30.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4195613B | Global Dossier | 10.12.2008 | B2 | JP2004529556 | 24.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0209232 | 26.03.2002 | US82368001 | 30.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1374427 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2009 | B1 | EP1374427 | 28.12.2005 | A4 | EP1374427 | 02.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0209232 | 26.03.2002 | US82368001 | 30.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60231483D1 | 23.04.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0209232 | 26.03.2002 | US82368001 | 30.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02080390 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82368001 | 30.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE425592T | 15.03.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US82368001 | 30.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1322678C | 20.06.2007 | C | CN1500313 | 26.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US82368001 | 30.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW563302B | 21.11.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US82368001 | 30.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6671500 | 30.12.2003 | B2 | US2002183030 | 05.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82368001 | 30.03.2001 |