EP1374427 - FREQUENCY PLAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skyworks Solutions, Inc. 5221 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2004/10] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Conexant Systems, Inc. 4311 Jamboree Road Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLNAR, Alyosha, C. 747 Knapp Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93108 / US | 02 /
MAGOON, Rahul 102 Southbrook Irvine, CA 92604 / US | 03 /
DOMINO, William, J. 4740 Via Corona Yorba Linda, CA 92887-1813 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Andrew 19218 Cecelia Place Cerritos, CA 90703 / US | 05 /
DAMGAARD, Morten 24911 Sausalito Street Laguna Hills, CA 92653-5208 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02721580.5 | 26.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US09232 | Priority number, date | US20010823680 | 30.03.2001 Original published format: US 823680 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02080390 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374427 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374427 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/40 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H03D7/163 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H03L7/185 (EP,US);
H03L7/1974 (EP,US);
H04B1/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREQUENZPLAN | [2004/01] | English: | FREQUENCY PLAN | [2004/01] | French: | PLAN DE FREQUENCE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | BE | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IT | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | IE | 26.03.2009 | LU | 26.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | ES | 22.06.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 26.03.2009 | ||
LU | 26.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 26.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 26.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 26.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 26.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 11.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0905879 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0041]; figure 2 *; | [X]WO0120774 (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-23* page 1, line 1 - page 26, line 7; figures 1-10 * | International search | [X]US4211975 (KURODA MASAHIRO [JP]); | [X]US4479257 (AKIYAMA KOJI [JP]); | [Y]US5696950 (ICHINOSE KAZUSHIGE [JP], et al); | [Y]US6122506 (LAU CHUNG Y [US], et al) |