EP1405129 - POLARIZERS FOR USE WITH LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | 28.11.2008 | Change - representative | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAPANI, Giorgio, B. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SMYTH, William, K. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
RALLI, Philip, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
GORDON, James, N. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
CAEL, John, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
BRANCA, John, C. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
FORESYTH, David, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
SUZUKI, Atsushi P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
PUGH, William P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02721762.9 | 17.04.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US11962 | Priority number, date | US20010897318 | 02.07.2001 Original published format: US 897318 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03005112 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405129 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G02F1/133528 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLARISATOREN FÜR FLÜSSIGKRISTALLDISPLAYS | [2004/15] | English: | POLARIZERS FOR USE WITH LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS | [2004/15] | French: | POLARISEURS UTILISES AVEC DES AFFICHAGES A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 19.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 29.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/01] | 30.07.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10260395 ; | [A]US5666223 (BENNETT STEWART [US], et al) [A] 1-3,19-23* column 1 - column 3 *; | [Y]US5926293 (RALLI PHILIP J [US]) [Y] 16 * abstract *; | [Y]US6141070 (KANEKO YASUSHI [JP]) [Y] 11,12 * column 8, line 65 - column 10, line 23; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO0065385 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 17,18 * page 5, line 5 - page 9, line 2; figure 1C *; | [Y]WO0131393 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-10,13-15,21-23 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 26 * * page 10, line 1 - line 14 * * page 12, line 12 - page 13, line 6 * * page 15, line 1 - line 26 * * figures 1,3,6 *; | [PX]WO0210845 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [PX] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [Y] - DELPICO J ET AL, "Plastics in flat panel displays", ITG-FACHBERICHT, CONFERENCE ON DISPLAYS AND VACUUM ELECTRONICS, GARMISCH-PARTENKIRCHEN, Germany, (19980429), no. 150, pages 105 - 110, XP001094690 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10260395 A 19980929 (NISSHA PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 19,20 * abstract * |