EP1508561 - 2-(a-HYDROXYPENTYL) BENZOATE AND ITS PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIA MEDICA OF CHINESE ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES 1 Xian Nong Tan Street Xuan Wu Dist. Beijing 100050 / CN | [2009/39] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIA MEDICA OF CHINESE ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES 1 Xian Nong Tan Street Xuan Wu Dist., Beijing 100050 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Jinghua 1 Xian Nong Tan Street Xuanwu District, Beijing 100050 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xiaoliang 1 Xian Nong Tan Street Xuanwu District, Beijing 100050 / CN | 03 /
XU, Zhibin 1 Xian Nong Tan Street Xuanwu District, Beijing 100050 / CN | 04 /
PENG, Ying 1 Xian Nong Tan Street Xuanwu District, Beijing 100050 / CN | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Kampfenkel, Klaus, et al Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | Kampfenkel, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02721974.0 | 09.05.2002 | [2005/08] | WO2002CN00320 | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095412 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508561 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508561 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C65/03, C07C51/00, A61K31/19, A61P9/10 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
C07C65/03 (EP,US);
C07F1/06 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C65/01 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/35] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZOATESÄURE-2-(a-HYDROXYPENTYL)ESTER UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2005/08] | English: | 2-(a-HYDROXYPENTYL) BENZOATE AND ITS PREPARATION AND USE | [2005/08] | French: | 2-(a-HYDROXYPENTYL) BENZOATE, SA PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2009/39] |
Former [2005/08] | 2-(G(A)-HYDROXYPENTYL) BENZOATE,SA PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2004 | Translation filed | 02.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 02.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09010765.7 / EP2186792 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 09.12.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BERLINGOZZI, S. ET AL., "Sulle idroftalidi. - IV. Sul derivato n-butilico della delta.6-tetraidroftalide", GAZZETTA CHIMICA ITALIANA., ITSOCIETA CHIMICA ITALIANA, ROME., (1927), vol. 57, pages 255 - 264, XP008065030 [A] 1,6,7 * page 260 * | International search | [X]CN1283621 (INST OF MEDICINAL MATERIALS CH [CN]); | [E]CN1382682 (INST OF MEDICAL MATERIALS CHIN [CN]) |