EP1372766 - SYRINGE FOR VISCOELASTIC SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/01] | SPRITZE FÜR VISKOELASTISCHE LÖSUNGEN | ||
[2007/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratoire de Contactologie Appliquée - LCA 9, allée Prométhée, Z.I. Les Propylées 28000 Chartres / FR | [2010/08] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Laboratoire de Contactologie Appliquée - LCA 9, allée Prométhée, Z.I. Les Propylées 28000 Chartres / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINCENT, Patrice 8, rue de Chimay F-28130 Mevoisins / FR | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | CAPRI 33 rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/01] | CAPRI 94, avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02722375.9 | 26.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002FR01035 | Priority number, date | FR20010004090 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: FR 0104090 | [2004/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02076534 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372766 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372766 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/28, A61M5/315 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
A61M5/286 (EP,US);
A61M5/284 (EP,US);
A61M5/31596 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1787 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRITZE FÜR VISKOELASTISCHE LÖSUNGEN | [2004/01] | English: | SYRINGE FOR VISCOELASTIC SOLUTIONS | [2007/21] | French: | SERINGUE POUR SOLUTIONS VISCOELASTIQUES | [2004/01] |
Former [2004/01] | SPRITZE FÜR VISKOELASTISCHE LÖSUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | IE | 24.02.2010 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/46] | FI | 24.02.2010 | |
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 24.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4702737 (PIZZINO JOANNE L [US]) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 34 - line 61 * * column 3, line 21 - line 58 * * figure - *; | [XY]EP0695555 (HIGASHIKAWA TETSURO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * figures 1,6 * [Y] 4; | [XA]US5865799 (TANAKA NOBUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * column 4, line 22 - line 23 * * column 6, line 23 - line 49 * * figures 5,7A * [A] 3-5; | [A]EP0974320 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) [A] 1,3,7-9,6,8 * abstract *; | [XP]WO0211793 (MEDICAL INFORMATION SERVICES I [JP], et al) [XP] 1-3* abstract *; | [XPA]US2002035351 (LODICE CHRISTOPHER CHARLES [US]) [XP] 1,2 * page 1, column R, line 21 - line 37; figure - * [A] 3,4 | Examination | FR2110516 | US4929230 |