EP1377815 - Biological measurement system and method of its use. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/02] | BIOLOGICAL MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | ||
[2015/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rapid Biosensor Systems Limited Brunswick House, 61-69 Newmarket Road Cambridge CB5 8EG / GB | [2016/01] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Rapid Biosensor Systems Limited Brunswick House, 61-69 Newmarket Road Cambridge CB5 8EG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCASH, Elaine, Marie 20 Cross Lane Close Orwell Royston SG8 5QW / GB | 02 /
WHEELER, Gavin, Vashon Flat 2, 52 Gwydir Street Cambridge CB2 2LL / GB | 03 /
COLBY, Edward, Grellier 45 Argyle Street Cambridge CB1 3LR / GB | 04 /
STORKEY, Matthew, Emmanuel, Milton 166 Foster Road Trumpington Cambridge CB2 2JP / GB | 05 /
STEWART, James, Neil 32 Eltisley Avenue Cambridge CB3 9JG / GB | 06 /
MURRAY, Nicol, John 70 Pennine Avenue Luton LU3 3GH / GB | 07 /
GLAUSER, Antony 32 Malcolm Place King Street Cambridge CB1 1LS / GB | [2016/01] |
Former [2004/02] | 01 /
MCCASH, Elaine, Marie 20 Cross Lane Close, Orwell Royston SG8 5QW / GB | ||
02 /
WHEELER, Gavin, Vashon Flat 2, 52 Gwydir Street Cambridge CB2 2LL / GB | |||
03 /
COLBY, Edward, Grellier 45 Argyle Street Cambridge CB1 3LR / GB | |||
04 /
STORKEY, Matthew, Emmanuel, Milton 166 Foster Road, Trumpington Cambridge CB2 2JP / GB | |||
05 /
STEWART, James, Neil 32 Eltisley Avenue Cambridge CB3 9JG / GB | |||
06 /
MURRAY, Nicol, John 70 Pennine Avenue Luton LU3 3GH / GB | |||
07 /
GLAUSER, Antony 32 Malcolm Place, King Street Cambridge CB1 1LS / GB | Representative(s) | Norris, Timothy Sweyn Basck 50 - 60 Station Road Cambridge CB1 2JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Norris, Timothy Sweyn Basck IPR Ltd. 9 Meadowford Newport Saffron Walden, Essex CB11 3QL / GB | ||
Former [2013/27] | Norris, Timothy Sweyn BasckIPR Ltd. 9 Meadowford Newport Saffron Walden Essex CB11 3QL / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Norwich Research Park Colney Norwich NR4 7UT / GB | ||
Former [2004/02] | Jones, William i.p.21 Limited Norwich Research Park Colney Norwich NR4 7UT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02722430.2 | 11.04.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002GB01740 | Priority number, date | GB20010008993 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: GB 0108993 | GB20010021039 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: GB 0121039 | GB20010022881 | 24.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0122881 | GB20010026001 | 30.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0126001 | GB20020000265 | 08.01.2002 Original published format: GB 0200265 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02084266 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1377815 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377815 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/55, G01N21/77, G01N33/543, G01N33/569, G01N33/58, A61B5/097, A61B5/00, // G01N1/22, G01N1/24 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/582 (EP,US);
G01N33/533 (KR);
A61B5/097 (EP,US);
A61B5/411 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N21/648 (EP,US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N33/56911 (EP,US);
G01N33/5695 (EP,US);
G01N2001/2244 (EP,US);
G01N2001/247 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/02] | G01N21/64, G01N21/55, G01N21/77, G01N1/40, G01N1/28, G01N33/535 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2004/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Biologisches Messsystem und Verfahren zu dessen Benutzung. | [2015/31] | English: | Biological measurement system and method of its use. | [2015/31] | French: | Système de mesure biologique et procédé pour son utilisation | [2015/31] |
Former [2004/02] | BIOLOGISCHES MESSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2004/02] | BIOLOGICAL MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | ||
Former [2004/02] | SYSTEME DE MESURE BIOLOGIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | GR | 31.03.2016 | LU | 11.04.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/04] | GR | 31.03.2016 | |
LU | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | GR | 31.03.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5573009 (THIEME THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9,10,12-16,19,20 * column 4, line 26 - line 35 * * column 5, line 48 - line 52 * * column 7, line 5 - line 23 *; | [XY]US4947861 (HAMILTON LYLE H [US]) [X] 1,2,8,11,12,21 * column 4, line 32 - line 34 * * column 4, line 46 - line 53 * * column 5, line 14 - line 19 * * column 5, line 63 - line 65 * [Y] 6,7; | [A]EP0412417 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 9,10 * column 5, line 38 - line 41 * | [YDA] - MASAKAZU YOSHIDA ET AL, "SENSITIVITY ENHANCEMENT OF EVANESCENT WAVE IMMUNOASSAY", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (19931001), vol. 4, no. 10, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 1077 - 1079, XP000399921 [YD] 6,7 * the whole document * [A] 15,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/4/10/008 | Examination | DE19718924 | WO0184112 |