EP1564176 - ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONDA, Takenobu, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02722861.8 | 26.04.2002 | [2005/33] | WO2002JP04271 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091141 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1564176 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/34, B66B7/00, B66B11/02, B66B5/00 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B66B7/021 (EP);
B66B11/08 (KR);
B66B11/008 (EP);
B66B11/0226 (EP);
B66B5/0087 (EP);
B66B17/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/33] | B66B1/34, B66B7/00, B66B11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2005/33] | Title | German: | LIFT | [2005/33] | English: | ELEVATOR | [2005/33] | French: | ASCENSEUR | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2003 | Translation filed | 02.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2003 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 04.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/38] | 02.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0489787 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-2 * abstract * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]JPH10231074 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [Y] 3-4* abstract *; | [Y]WO0179104 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [Y] 3-5 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 19 * | International search | [X]JPH0489787 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2000238971 (HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000247560 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2001106461 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2001233555 (HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD); | [A]JP2001253659 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JPH0489787 | JPH10139321 |