EP1404312 - CARBAMATE COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville, NJ 08560 / US | [2011/19] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. U.S. Route No.202 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLATA-SALAMAN, Carlos, R. 1313 Squire Drive Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 02 /
ZHAO, Boyu 106 Weymouth Circle Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 03 /
TWYMAN, Roy, E. 3355 Byron Drive Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02723222.2 | 21.02.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US05421 | Priority number, date | US20010271888P | 27.02.2001 Original published format: US 271888 P | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02067922 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404312 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404312 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/27, A61P25/04 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61K31/325 (KR);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | A61K31/27 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CARBAMATVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZ | [2004/15] | English: | CARBAMATE COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF PAIN | [2004/15] | French: | COMPOSES CARBAMATES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3265728 (BOSSINGER CHARLES D, et al) [DA] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]US3278380 (BOSSINGER CHARLES D, et al) [A] 1-27* the whole document *; | [DA]US6103759 (CHOI YONG MOON [US], et al) [DA] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0207822 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [PX] 1-27 * abstract * * formula(I), (Ib) * * claim - * * page 1, lines 11-16 * |