Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] |
12.10.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.04.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
22.04.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
31.03.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.10.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
10.10.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
27.09.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant | |
06.11.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.09.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.06.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication |