Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1364427 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0205987 | 19.02.2002 | US27005501 | 20.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002140518 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7878502 | 19.02.2002 | US27005501 | 20.02.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02067367 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27005501 | 20.02.2001 |