EP1382009 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING REMOTE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE Pacific Northwest Laboratories Intellectual Property Services 902 Battelle Boulevard P.O. Box 999 Richland, WA 99352 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE Pacific Northwest Division, Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 999 Richland, WA 99352 / US | ||
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE Pacific Northwest Division, Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 999 Richland, WA 99352 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRENDER, Curtis, Lee 18410 Butterfield Blvd., Suite 150 Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | 02 /
GILBERT, Ronald, W. 65105 N. Demoss Road Benton City, WA 99320 / US | 03 /
SCOTT, Jeff, W. 3905 North Road 96 Pasco, WA 99301 / US | 04 /
CLARK, David, A. 713 S. Belfair St. Kennewick, WA 99336 / US | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/04] | 01 /
CARRENDER, Curtis, Lee 1110 Country Ridge Drive Richland, WA 99352 / US | ||
02 /
GILBERT, Ronald, W. 65105 N. Demoss Road Benton City, WA 99320 / US | |||
03 /
SCOTT, Jeff, W. 3905 North Road 96 Pasco, WA 99301 / US | |||
04 /
CLARK, David, A. 713 S. Belfair St. Kennewick, WA 99336 / US | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02723737.9 | 01.04.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002US10296 | Priority number, date | US20010833465 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: US 833465 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02084584 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382009 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382009 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K7/00, G08B13/14, F41A17/08 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
G06K19/07758 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON ENTFERNTEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2004/04] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING REMOTE DEVICES | [2004/04] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIFS DISTANTS | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | BE | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | CY | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | FR | 28.03.2008 | IE | 01.04.2008 | LU | 01.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
TR | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
LU | 01.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
LU | 01.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 01.08.2007 | |
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 12.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5448847 (TEETZEL JAMES W [US]); | [A]US5528221 (JEUCH PIERRE [FR], et al); | [XY]US6025780 (BOWERS JOHN H [US], et al); | [A]US6147605 (VEGA VICTOR ALLEN [US], et al); | [X]US6181248 (FOCKENS TALLIENCO WIEAND [NL]) | Examination | GB2119552 | US5430656 |