EP1402387 - APPROACH FOR CACHING ELECTRONIC PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Inktomi Corporation 4100 East Third Avenue Forster City, California 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LITTLEFIELD, Andrew 461 2nd Street, Apt. T660 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/14] | 01 /
LITTLEFIELD, Andrew 2201 Bridgepointe Avenue No.320 San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/14] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02723752.8 | 03.04.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002US10428 | Priority number, date | US20010827282 | 04.04.2001 Original published format: US 827282 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02082708 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1402387 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402387 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06Q30/00, H04L29/06 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L67/561 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/44] | G06F15/16, G06F17/60, H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2004/14] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/42] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSATZ ZUR CACHE-SPEICHERUNG ELEKTRONISCHER PRODUKTE | [2004/14] | English: | APPROACH FOR CACHING ELECTRONIC PRODUCTS | [2004/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE MISE EN MEMOIRE CACHE DE PRODUITS ELECTRONIQUES | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.03.2006 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 04.04.2006 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6018619 (ALLARD JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,12,16,17,19,21-24,31,32,34,36-39 * figure 2 * * column 5, paragraphs 1,4,9 * * column 9, paragraphs 3,5 ** column 10, paragraph 3 *; | [XA]WO0113578 (ORBLYNX INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7-10,16-18,22-25,31-33,37-39 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph L * * page 14, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 2 * [A] 4-6,11-15,19-21,26-30,34-36,40-42; | [E]WO0237489 (INKTOMI CORP [US]) [E] 1,2,4-10,12,13,16,17,19-25,27,28,31,32,34-40,42 * abstract * * page 5, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraphs 2-4 * | International search | [A]US5991306 (BURNS GREGORY [US], et al); | [X]US6018619 (ALLARD JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]US6151634 (GLASER ROBERT D [US], et al) |