EP1395322 - INHALATION HANDSET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERSURGICAL LIMITED Crane House Molly Millars Lane Wokingham Berkshire RG41 2RZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states INTERSURGICAL LIMITED Crane House Molly Millars Lane Wokingham Berkshire RG41 2RZ / GB | ||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states INTERSURGICAL LIMITED Crane House Molly Millars Lane Wokingham Berkshire RG41 2RZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITTAWAY, Alan Kenneth 138 Brands Hill Avenue, Terriers High Wycombe, Buckinghamshire HP13 5QP / GB | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02724487.0 | 13.05.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002GB02193 | Priority number, date | GB20010012264 | 19.05.2001 Original published format: GB 0112264 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02094360 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395322 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395322 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/01 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
A61M16/0093 (EP);
A61M16/049 (EP);
A61M16/01 (EP);
A61M16/1055 (EP);
A61M16/208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/35] |
Former [2004/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDTEIL EINES INHALATORS | [2004/11] | English: | INHALATION HANDSET | [2004/11] | French: | PIECE A MAIN POUR INHALATION | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 15.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.2005 | BE | 14.09.2005 | CH | 14.09.2005 | CY | 14.09.2005 | FI | 14.09.2005 | LI | 14.09.2005 | NL | 14.09.2005 | TR | 14.09.2005 | DK | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.12.2005 | SE | 14.12.2005 | ES | 25.12.2005 | PT | 14.02.2006 | LU | 13.05.2006 | IE | 15.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
TR | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 13.05.2006 | ||
IE | 15.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 15.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
SE | 14.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4048993 (DOBRITZ GUNTER) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, lines 46-61; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4463755 (SUZUKI TATSUO [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0604399 (GAMBRO ENGSTROM AB [SE]) [Y] 1-8 * column 7, lines 13-26; figure 13 *; | [A]WO9748433 (INTAVENT ORTHOFIX LIMITED [GB], et al) [A] 9-13 * figure 3 *; | [A]US5871011 (HOWELL PENELOPE JANE [GB], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * |