Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100508324B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2005 | B1 | KR20030031555 | 21.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001152504 | 22.05.2001 | JP0204424 | 07.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1426111 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001152504 | 22.05.2001 | JP0204424 | 07.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02094444 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001152504 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003141394 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001152504 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002346415 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001152504 | 22.05.2001 |