EP1426111 - SELF-PROPELLING WOOD CRUSHER AND WOOD CRUSHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Kazunori 20-29-407, Kandatsuchuo 2-chome Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0011 / JP | 02 /
SEKI, Kazuhide 3-10, Onogawa Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0053 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Masamichi 20-29-213, Kandatsuchuo 2-chome Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0011 / JP | 04 /
SHIBA, Yoshimi 750-1, Takasai Shimotsuma-shi, Ibaraki 304-0031 / JP | 05 /
IIDA, Tsutomu 4-1-509, Inayoshiminami 2-chome, Chiyodamachi Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 315-0055 / JP | 06 /
YAGISHITA, Makoto 1828-1-325, Niihari, Chiyodamachi Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 315-0051 / JP | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02724694.1 | 07.05.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002JP04424 | Priority number, date | JP20010152504 | 22.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001152504 | [2004/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02094444 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1426111 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B02C23/02, B02C21/02, B02C18/18, B27L11/00 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B02C21/026 (EP,US);
B27L11/06 (KR);
B02C18/18 (EP,US);
B02C18/2241 (EP,US);
B02C2023/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/24] | Title | German: | HOLZZERKLEINERUNGSMASCHINE MIT SELBSTANTRIEB UND HOLZZERKLEINERUNGSMASCHINE | [2004/24] | English: | SELF-PROPELLING WOOD CRUSHER AND WOOD CRUSHER | [2004/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DEFIBRAGE DU BOIS AUTOMOTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE DEFIBRAGE DU BOIS | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2003 | Translation filed | 03.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2003 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS346196Y ; | [Y]DE2127971 (COACHELLA VALLEY ORGANIC FRETI); | [Y]JPS60194503U ; | [X]JPS62148355U ; | [Y]JPH027222U ; | [Y]JPH0584451 (TAKIRON CO); | [Y]JPH10156210 (KOMATSU ZENOA KK); | [A]JPH10331185 (JIYAKUTEI ENG KK); | [Y]US5947395 (PETERSON ARNOLD N [US], et al); | [Y]JPH11347440 (KOMATSU ZENOA KK); | [Y]JP3065694U |