EP1471871 - TREATMENT OF NEUROLOGICAL DYSFUNCTION COMPRISING FRUCTOPYRANOSE SULFAMATES AND ERYTHROPOIETIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. U.S. Route No. 202, P.O. Box 300 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. One Johnson & Johnson Plaza New Brunswick, NJ 08933-7003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLATA SALAMAN, Carlos 1313 Squire Drive Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 02 /
SMITH-SWINTOSKY, Virginia 3163 Line Lexington Road Hatfield, PA 19440 / US | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02724904.4 | 24.01.2002 | [2004/45] | WO2002US03096 | Priority number, date | US20010266194P | 02.02.2001 Original published format: US 266194 P | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02064085 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1471871 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471871 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K31/70 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K38/22 (KR);
A61K31/357 (EP,US);
A61K38/1816 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/357, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/1816, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2004/45] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/45] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON NEUROLOGISCHEN FUNKTIONSSTÖRUNGEN MIT FRUCTOPYRANOSESULFAMATEN UND ERYTHROPOETIN | [2004/45] | English: | TREATMENT OF NEUROLOGICAL DYSFUNCTION COMPRISING FRUCTOPYRANOSE SULFAMATES AND ERYTHROPOIETIN | [2004/45] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE DYSFONCTIONNEMENTS NEUROLOGIQUES AU MOYEN DE SULFAMATES DE FRUCTOPYRANOSE ET D'ERYTHROPOIETINE | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 12.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0061164 (KENNETH S WARREN LAB [US]) [Y] 1-24* page 13, line 18 - line 35 *; | [PY] - ELSEVIER - MOSBY'S DRUG CONSULT, (20010904), URL: http://mosbysdrugconsult.com/DrugConsult/newind2001.html, (20050906), XP002343683 [PY] 1-24 * page 4: Topamax (topiramate) Approved for the Treatment of Lennox-Gastaud Syndrome * | International search | [Y]WO0061138 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]); | [Y]WO0061164 (KENNETH S WARREN LAB [US]); | [Y] - SACHDEO ET AL, "Topioramate: clinical profile in epilepsy", CLIN. PHARMACOKINET., (199805), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 335 - 346, XP002978372 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003088-199834050-00001 |